Lazongas, Chris (CPSO#: 84795)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Greek

Education:University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Scarborough General Hospital
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone: (416) 438-2911 Ext. 3315
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Ontario Poison Centre
Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Canada
Phone: 4168135900
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Chris Lazongas Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 18 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Lazongas ( CPSO# 84795 )

Business Address:
Scarborough General Hospital
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone Number: (416) 438-2911

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 26 Sep 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Clinical Pharmacology and Toxicology Effective: 26 Sep 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRIS LAZONGAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAZONGAS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Pharmacology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010