Lazowski, James Conrad (CPSO#: 57209)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jul 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 211
99 Kakulu Road
Ottawa ON  K2L 3C8
Phone: (613) 591-0610
Fax: (613) 591-0612
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: James C. Lazowski Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 03 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Lazowski ( CPSO# 57209 )

Business Address:
99 Kakulu Road
Suite 211
Ottawa ON  K2L 3C8
Phone Number: (613) 591-0610

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMES CONRAD LAZOWSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAZOWSKI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1986 to 14 Jun 1987
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1987