Lazzam, Charles (CPSO#: 59189)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Feb 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Feb 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
101 Queensway West
Suite 206
Mississauga ON  L5B 2P7
Phone: (905) 615-0012
Fax: (905) 615-8537
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Charles Lazzam Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 30 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Lazzam ( CPSO# 59189 )

Business Address:
206 - 101 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2P7
Phone Number: (905) 615-0012

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1987 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 28 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHARLES LAZZAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAZZAM is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Feb 1988