Le Blanc, Patricia Francesca (CPSO#: 32257)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 Aug 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Aug 2009

Summary

Former Names: Mason, Patricia Francesca (used until: 12 Jul 2009 )     Le Blanc, Patricia Francesca (used until: 21 Apr 2004 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ultracare Medical Clinic
403 Parliament St
Toronto ON  M4J 2L3
Phone: (416) 923-2229
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Queen-Spadina Medical Centre
455 Queen St W
Toronto ON  M5V 2A9
Canada
Phone: 416 869-3627
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

245 Yorkland Blvd
Suite 403
Toronto ON  M2J 1S5
Canada
Phone: 416 229-2399
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PATRICIA FRANCESCA LE BLANC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LE BLANC is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Mar 1981
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 14 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2009