Le Blanc, Sarah Elizabeth (CPSO#: 100261)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 6
35 Bridge Street
Picton ON  K0K 2T0
Phone: (613) 476-6661
Electoral District: 06
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Sandbanks Medical Centre
12 Prince Edward Drive
Wellington ON  K0K 3L0
Canada
Phone: 613-399-1281
Fax: 613-399-2464
County: County of Prince Edward
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sarah Le Blanc Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 22 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Le Blanc ( CPSO# 100261)

Business Address:
35 Bridge Street
Unit 6
Picton ON  K0K 2T0
Phone Number: (613) 476-6661

Business Address:
Sandbanks Medical Centre
12 Prince Edward Drive
Wellington ON  K0K 3L0
Phone Number: (613) 399-1281

Business Address:
Prince Edward County Memorial Hospital
403 Picton Main Street
Picton ON  K0K 2T0
Phone Number: (613) 476-1008

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site Picton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SARAH ELIZABETH LE BLANC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LE BLANC is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 04 May 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 05 May 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jun 2016