Le Bouthillier, Annie Josee (CPSO#: 79940)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jan 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jul 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Laval University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1887 boulevard St. Joseph
Orleans ON  K1C 7J2
Phone: (613) 903-7563
Fax: (613) 903-7564
Electoral District: 07

Medical Records Location

Address: Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc. 111 St. Regis Crescent S. Toronto, Ontario M3J 1Y6 Tel: (416) 398-0638 Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732 Fax: (416) 398-5932 Website: www.rsrs.com
Date Received: 01 Jun 2010

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 27 Jun 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANNIE JOSEE LE BOUTHILLIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LE BOUTHILLIER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2003
Suspension of registration imposed: Inquiries, Complaints and Repo Effective: 06 Dec 2010
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 29 Jan 2013