Le, Brian Binh Ba Hai (CPSO#: 79105)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jul 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Vietnamese

Education:McMaster University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3443 Finch Ave. East
Suite 301
Scarborough ON  M1W 2S1
Phone: (416) 491-2193
Fax: (416) 491-6621
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Scarborough Hospital Grace Division
3030 Birchmount Road
GIM/Respirology Clinic
Toronto ON  M1W 3W3
Canada
Phone: (416) 495-2465
Fax: (416) 495-2420
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brian Binh Le Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 28 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Le ( CPSO# 79105 )

Business Address:
The Scarborough Hospital
GIM/Respirology Clinic
3030 Birchmount Road
Birchmount Campus
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Phone Number: (416) 495-2600

Business Address:
301 - 3443 Finch Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1W 2S1
Phone Number: (416) 491-2193

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRIAN BINH BA HAI LE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 2007