Le Brun, David Pierre (CPSO#: 54311)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1985


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Richardson Laboratory
Department of Pathology
Queen's University
Kingston ON  K7L 3N6
Phone: (613) 533-3209
Fax: (613) 533-2907
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David LeBrun Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 20 2013

Dr. D. Le Brun ( CPSO# 54311 )

Business Address:
Richardson Laboratory
Department of Pathology
88 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 3N6
Phone Number: (613) 533-3209

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston


Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 31 May 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. DAVID PIERRE LE BRUN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LE BRUN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1984 to 15 Jun 1985
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1986 to 31 Dec 1986
Resident 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1987 to 31 Dec 1987
Resident 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1988 to 31 Dec 1988
Resident 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1985