Le Feuvre, Catherine Anne (CPSO#: 59383)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 May 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 206
101 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2P7
Phone: (905) 615-1441
Fax: (905) 615-8537
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiology Effective: 29 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 16 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CATHERINE ANNE LE FEUVRE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LE FEUVRE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 5 - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 May 1990