Le, Hoang Yen (CPSO#: 65290)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Vietnamese

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Pediatrics and Family Clinic
1218 King Street West
Toronto ON  M6K 1G4
Phone: (416) 538-8833
Fax: (416) 538-7685
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Sally and Sam Shapiro Babies and
Children Medical Center
1750 17th street
Sarasota FL  34234
United States
Phone: 941 8611400
County: 
Electoral District: 

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Florida

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Oct 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HOANG YEN LE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Other - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993