Le, Lan Bao (CPSO#: 100198)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 May 2016

Expiry Date:  08 May 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 09 May 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Medical University of the Americas, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Southmount Health Care Centre
35 Upper Centennial Parkway
Stoney Creek ON  L8J 3W2
Phone: (905) 662-3378
Fax: (905) 592-2325
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lan Bao Le Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 06 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Le ( CPSO# 100198)

Business Address:
Southmount Healthcare Centre
2B - 35 Upper Centennial Parkway
Stoney Creek ON  L8J 3W2
Phone Number: (905) 662-3378

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 May 2016 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 23 Sep 2013
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 May 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 08 May 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 09 May 2016 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Lan Bao Le may practise family medicine at the Southmount Health Care
                  Centre in Stoney Creek, Ontario, while under supervision coordinated by a
                  supervisor acceptable to the College.

            2.    The  certificate  of  registration automatically expires three years from
                  the date of issuance or  when Dr. Le's eligibility to take the College of
                  Family Physicians of Canada examination expires, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration  automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee  renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the supervisor notifies the College of  any  concerns regarding Dr.
                        Le's knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude, does  not  provide the
                        required  reports to the College by the due date or if the  reports
                        are unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (ii)  the supervisor  is  no  longer  able  or  willing  to  continue  to
                        supervise Dr. Le's practice.
                  
                  
            Note: This  certificate  is issued on May 9, 2016, and will expire on or before
                  May 8, 2019, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.