Le Lievre, Christine Mavis (CPSO#: 59519)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jan 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Juravinski Cancer Centre
699 Concession Street
Hamilton , ON
Hamilton ON  L8V 5C2
Phone: (905) 336-4103
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTINE MAVIS LE LIEVRE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LE LIEVRE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 1990