Le Marquand, Wendy Jane (CPSO#: 61917)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 25 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 25 Jul 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1984 CFPC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 1990 to 30 Apr 1990
Clinical Fellow - Community Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Apr 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1998