Le May, Joseph Michel Robert (CPSO#: 42669)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jun 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite H-2247
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone: 613-696-7297
Fax: 613-696-7134
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michel Le May Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 11 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Le May ( CPSO# 42669 )

Business Address:
University of Ottawa Heart Institute
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone Number: (613) 761-4223

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Virginia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 1982 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 03 Dec 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOSEPH MICHEL ROBERT LE MAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LE MAY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1978
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 1984