Le Riche, Nicole Georgina Harding (CPSO#: 30491)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Feb 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Feb 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John M. Howard Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 8 2018

Medical Records Location

Address: Command Services Limited Records Management 100 Picadilly Street London ON N6A 1R8 Phone: 519-672-1460
Date Received: 20 Jan 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 17 Nov 1981 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 06 Dec 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Nov 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Jun 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Feb 2015