Le, Trung Ngoc (CPSO#: 102424)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Mar 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Mar 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Vietnamese

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Otolaryngology-Head & Neck Surgery
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Room M1.102
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4142
Fax: (416) 480-5761
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. T. N. Le Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 19 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Le ( CPSO# 102424)

Business Address:
Otolaryngology - Head & Neck Surgery
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Rom M1 102
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4142

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TRUNG NGOC LE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 06 Jan 2014 to 17 Jan 2014
Elective Trainee - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jan 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2016