Le, Tung Trong (CPSO#: 65085)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Vietnamese

Education:University of Ottawa, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
346 Bronson Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1R 6J3
Phone: (613) 233-9505
Fax: (613) 233-1872
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Tung T. Le Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 06 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Le ( CPSO# 65085 )

Business Address:
346 Bronson Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1R 6J3
Phone Number: (613) 233-9505

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TUNG TRONG LE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
Other - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1993