LeBel, Marie-Eve (CPSO#: 81469)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Laval University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hand and Upper Limb Centre
St Joseph's Health Care
268 Grosvenor Street
Suite D0-202
London ON  N6A 4L6
Phone: (519) 646-6153
Fax: (519) 646-6049
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: LeBel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 09 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. LeBel ( CPSO# 81469 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Health Care
Hand and Upper Limb Centre
Suite D0-202
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4L6
Phone Number: (519) 646-6153

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre South Street Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARIE-EVE LEBEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEBEL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2004 to 31 Jul 2005
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004