Lea, Janice Fang Chin (CPSO#: 68224)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 1996

Summary

Former Name: Wei, Janice Fang Chin (used until: 28 Jul 1999 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
York Medical
181 Green Lane East
Unit 2
East Gwillimbury ON  L9N 0C9
Phone: (905) 868-9243
Fax: (905) 836-1597
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JANICE FANG CHIN LEA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1996