Leader, Arthur (CPSO#: 25856)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Jan 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jan 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Fertility Centre
Unit 200
955 Green Valley Crescent
Ottawa ON  K2C 3V4
Phone: (613) 686-3378 Ext. 440
Fax: (613) 225-9736
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 13 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ARTHUR LEADER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEADER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Jan 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Dec 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 25 Sep 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 1986