Leadman, Martha Louise (CPSO#: 50903)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Aug 1979

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Aug 1983

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Martha Leadman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 16 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Leadman ( CPSO# 50903 )

Business Address:
Leamington District Memorial Hospital
194 Talbot Street West
Leamington ON  N8H 1N9
Phone Number: (519) 322-2501

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Erie Shores HealthCare Leamington

Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  November 17, 2017
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On November 14, 2017, Erin Shores HealthCare notified the College, pursuant to s.33 of the Public Hospitals Act and s.85.5 of the Health Professions Procedural Code, Regulated Health Professions Act, that Dr. Martha L. Leadman resigned her privileges at Erin Shores HealthCare in connection with concerns regarding Dr. Leadman’s radiology practice at Erin Shores Healthcare.

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 10 Jun 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARTHA LOUISE LEADMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEADMAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 1983