Leaf, Suzanne (CPSO#: 79588)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 Aug 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Aug 2004

Summary

Former Name: Leaf, Suzanne Carol (used until: 19 Jul 2004 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Minnesota, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
189 Elm Street
St Thomas ON  N5R 5C4
Phone: (519) 207-3018
Fax: (519) 637-0449
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Suzanne Leaf Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 05 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Leaf ( CPSO# 79588 )

Business Address:
189 Elm Street
St Thomas ON  N5R 5C4
Phone Number: (519) 207-3018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 11 Sep 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUZANNE LEAF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEAF is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 20 Oct 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 14 Jul 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 6 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2004