Leahy, Jesse Isobel (CPSO#: 67998)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 16 May 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 16 May 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Altru Clinic - Baudette
5th Street Southwest
Baudette MN  56623
United States
Phone: (218) 634-1655

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1999 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 06 Apr 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 07 Apr 1997 to 16 May 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 May 1997