Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Leahy, Marilyn Theresa (CPSO#: 57088)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 May 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 May 1997

Summary

Former Name: Leahy, Marilyn Theresa (used until: 22 Oct 1987 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Group Health Centre
240 McNabb Street
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 1Y5
Phone: (705) 759-1234
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Fera Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 27 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Mogharrabi ( CPSO# 57473 )
Dr. B. Mitchell ( CPSO# 59931 )
Dr. D. Micomonaco ( CPSO# 80815 )
Dr. M. Mathew ( CPSO# 44024 )
Dr. M. Leahy ( CPSO# 57088 )
Dr. M. Lee ( CPSO# 62320 )
Dr. J. Lane ( CPSO# 61549 )
Dr. C. Kobelka ( CPSO# 62567 )
Dr. M. Keating ( CPSO# 57489 )
Dr. M. Hackett ( CPSO# 33820 )
Dr. H. Gupta ( CPSO# 78301 )
Dr. R. Gieni ( CPSO# 67230 )
Dr. D. Fritz ( CPSO# 60812 )
Dr. S. Fratesi ( CPSO# 27368 )
Dr. D. Fera ( CPSO# 33299 )
Dr. A. Fam ( CPSO# 62586 )
Dr. M. Edwards ( CPSO# 52889 )
Dr. S. Allen ( CPSO# 73014 )
Dr. E. Barrett ( CPSO# 56931 )
Dr. D. Beck ( CPSO# 50245 )
Dr. E. Beduhn ( CPSO# 26647 )
Dr. S. Bondar ( CPSO# 59698 )
Dr. P. Bragaglia ( CPSO# 33769 )
Dr. C. Bruni ( CPSO# 55651 )
Dr. D. Brooks ( CPSO# 26921 )
Dr. S. Buehner ( CPSO# 65582 )
Dr. D. Burrows ( CPSO# 50233 )
Dr. P. Catania ( CPSO# 31907 )
Dr. P. Ciaschini ( CPSO# 52948 )
Dr. M. Hemy ( CPSO# 86777 )
Dr. J. Keuhl ( CPSO# 88070 )
Dr. K. Opryszczko ( CPSO# 89989 )
Dr. E. Hirvi ( CPSO# 84322 )
Dr. C. Kuntz ( CPSO# 84476 )
Dr. A. Schamp ( CPSO# 82979 )
Dr. J. DellaVedova ( CPSO# 91071 )
Dr. J. DellaVedova ( CPSO# 91071 )
Dr. J. Patterson ( CPSO# 91088 )
Dr. J. Bishop ( CPSO# 96910 )
Dr. W. Chung ( CPSO# 99567 )
Dr. R. Tull ( CPSO# 93890 )
Dr. W. Wallace ( CPSO# 92960 )
Dr. M. Jenkins ( CPSO# 99889 )
Dr. L. Bonder ( CPSO# 90576 )
Dr. K. Zufelt ( CPSO# 67007 )
Dr. P. Zehr ( CPSO# 59997 )
Dr. G. Yee ( CPSO# 70560 )
Dr. R. Wytsma ( CPSO# 52032 )
Dr. K. Taylor ( CPSO# 75094 )
Dr. J. Stewart ( CPSO# 72520 )
Dr. B. Slagel ( CPSO# 79472 )
Dr. C. Rossi ( CPSO# 51523 )
Dr. J. Reich ( CPSO# 73103 )

Business Address:
240 McNabb Street
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 1Y5
Phone Number: (705) 759-5540

Business Address:
170 East Street
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 3C6
Phone Number: (705) 759-5540

Business Address:
955 Queen Street East
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 2C3
Phone Number: (705) 549-5540

Business Address:
974 Queen Street East
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 2C2
Phone Number: (705) 759-5540

Business Address:
773 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 5K7
Phone Number: (705) 759-5540


Corporation Name: Marilyn T. Leahy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 18 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Leahy ( CPSO# 57088 )

Business Address:
Group Health Centre
240 McNabb Street
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 1Y5
Phone Number: (705) 759-1234

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1988 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARILYN THERESA LEAHY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEAHY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1986 to 14 Jun 1987
Other - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Mar 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 17 Sep 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 May 1997