Leahy, Natalie Christine (CPSO#: 80827)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Mar 2007

Summary

Former Name: Baine, Natalie Christine (used until: 13 Nov 2005 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Taunton Health Centre
1290 Keith Ross Drive
Oshawa ON  L1H 7K4
Phone: (905) 721-4160
Fax: (905) 721-6872
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Ontario Shores Centre for Mental
Health Sciences
700 Gordon Street
Whitby ON  L1N 5S9
Canada
Phone: 905-425-0300
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Natalie Leahy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 18 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Leahy ( CPSO# 80827 )

Business Address:
Taunton Health Centre
1290 Keith Ross Drive
Oshawa ON  L1H 7K4
Phone Number: (905) 493-3592

Business Address:
700 Gordon Street
Whitby ON  L1N 5S9
Phone Number: (905) 430-4055

Business Address:
15 Mapleglen Court
Whitby ON  L1R 1T7
Phone Number: (905) 425-0300

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Ontario Shores Centre for Mental Health Sciences Whitby

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Mar 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NATALIE CHRISTINE LEAHY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEAHY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Mar 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Mar 2007