Leahy, Patrick Joseph (CPSO#: 65116)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kemptville Medical Center
P O Box 1859
Kemptville ON  K0G 1J0
Phone: (613) 258-4600
Fax: (613) 258-2799
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Patrick Leahy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 22 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Leahy ( CPSO# 65116 )

Business Address:
Kemptville Medical Centre
PO Box 1859
Kemptville ON  K0G 1J0
Phone Number: (613) 258-4600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PATRICK JOSEPH LEAHY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEAHY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Other - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1993