Leake, Pierre-Anthony Emile (CPSO#: 86036)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of the West Indies, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2007 to 15 Apr 2007
PEAP - Resident - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 16 Apr 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
Elective Trainee - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2010 to 25 Mar 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 26 Mar 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Apr 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Mar 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011