Leal Hernandez, Luis Fernando (CPSO#: 74340)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Autonomus University of Chihuahua, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Sep 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2001