Leal Melendez, Carlos (CPSO#: 75968)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 05 Apr 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 05 Apr 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Universidad De Monterrey, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2001 to 31 Dec 2001
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2003 to 05 Apr 2003
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Apr 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Apr 2003