Leary, Tara Jean (CPSO#: 75563)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Jun 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Northwood Recovery Clinic
2-80 Elm Street
Sudbury ON  P3C 1T2
Phone: (705) 8063737
Fax: (705) 8062985
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tara J. Leary Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 11 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Leary ( CPSO# 75563 )

Business Address:
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 675-4758

Business Address:
80-B Elm Street
Sudbury ON  P3C 1T2
Phone Number: (705) 806-3737

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Espanola General Hospital Espanola
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TARA JEAN LEARY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEARY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Aug 2000 to 31 Aug 2000
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2001 to 28 Feb 2001
Elective Trainee - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2001