Leasa, David John (CPSO#: 50904)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jul 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jul 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
University Hospital
339 Windermere Road
Office: B2-194e
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-3921
Fax: (519) 663-8813
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David J. Leasa Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 24 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Leasa ( CPSO# 50904 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
University Hospital
339 Windermere Road
Suite B2-194e
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 663-3921

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care,London - Parkwood Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Respirology Effective: 19 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 22 Nov 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID JOHN LEASA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEASA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1979
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 1985