Leatherdale, Charles Larry (CPSO#: 17965)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 04 Mar 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Mar 2013

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: East Elgin Family Health Team 424 Talbot Street West Aylmer ON N5H 1K9 Tel: 519-773-3715
Date Received: 29 Apr 2015

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1961
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 01 Mar 2004
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 01 May 2004
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Mar 2013

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 19 Jan 2004
Summary:

 On January 19, 2004, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Leatherdale to have committed acts of 
 professional misconduct that would reasonably be regarded as disgraceful, dishonourable or 
 unprofessional.

The Discipline Committee ordered and directed the following:

1)	that Dr. 
 Leatherdale(s certificate of registration to be suspended for a period of three (3) 	consecutive 
 months, commencing on March 1, 2004 at 12:01 a.m., one (1) month of 	which will be suspended if 
 Dr. Leatherdale provides evidence to the College of his 	successful completion of the College 
 Boundaries course;
2)	that Dr. Leatherdale attend before the Committee to be reprimanded;
3)	that 
 Dr. Leatherdale pay costs to the College in the amount of $2,500.00
4)	that the results of the 
 proceeding be included in the register.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Jan 19, 2004