Lebel, Daniel (CPSO#: 62861)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Oct 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Laval University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
107 Kelly Road
Smooth Rock Falls ON  P0L 2B0
Phone: (705) 338-2788
Fax: (705) 338-2933
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D. Lebel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 07 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Lebel ( CPSO# 62861 )

Business Address:
Falls Medical Clinic
107 Kelly Road
Smooth Rock Falls ON  P0L 2B0
Phone Number: (705) 338-2788

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sensenbrenner Hospital Kapuskasing
Smooth Rock Falls Hospital Smooth Rock Falls

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANIEL LEBEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEBEL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 1990