Lebert, Julie Marie (CPSO#: 100624)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 28 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 14 Sep 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Sep 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Dec 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2017 to 28 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Jun 2017