Lebert, Phyllis Angela (CPSO#: 54243)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site 237 Barton Street East Hamilton, ON L8L 2X2
Date Received: 01 Jun 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 16 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist
Clinical Immunology Effective: 29 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1984 to 15 Jun 1985
Resident 1 - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 4 - Clinical Immunology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 5 - Clinical Immunology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Dec 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015