Leblanc, Benoit (CPSO#: 87224)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Aug 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Aug 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 14 May 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Oct 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 02 Oct 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Aug 2008