Leblanc, Jos Louis Aurelien Richard (CPSO#: 42771)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 07 Aug 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 07 Aug 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 07 Dec 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1977 to 30 Jun 1978
Resident 1 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 19 Oct 1981 to 31 Dec 1981
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1977
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 1981
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1984
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 03 Aug 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2005
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Aug 2008