Leblanc, Robert Edward Murray (CPSO#: 61268)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Apr 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Apr 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
520 Notre Dame Street
Box 430
Belle River ON  N0R 1A0
Phone: (519) 715-9292
Fax: 519-715-9173
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. R.E.M. Leblanc Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 01 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Leblanc ( CPSO# 61268 )

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hospital
Met Campus
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone Number: (519) 254-5577

Business Address:
Grey Bruce Health Services
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Phone Number: (519) 376-2121

Business Address:
Leamington Hospital
194 Talbot Street West
Leamington ON  N8H 1N9
Phone Number: (519) 363-2373

Business Address:
520 Notre Dame Street
Belle River ON  N0R 1A0
Phone Number: (519) 715-9292

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hospital
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone Number: (519) 973-4411

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Erie Shores HealthCare Leamington
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound
Grey Bruce Health Services,Southampton Hospital Southampton
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT EDWARD MURRAY LEBLANC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEBLANC is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
Other - Rotating Internship

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Apr 2004