Leblanc, Yvan (CPSO#: 91689)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hawkesbury And District
General Hospital
1111 Ghislain Street
Hawkesbury ON  K6A 3G5
Phone: 613-631-1111
Fax: 613-636-6175
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Y. Leblanc Medecine Societe Professionnelle

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 23 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Leblanc ( CPSO# 91689 )

Business Address:
Hawkesbury and District
General Hospital
1111 Ghislain Street
Hawkesbury ON  K6A 3G5
Phone Number: (613) 632-1111

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hawkesbury & District General Hospital Hawkesbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YVAN LEBLANC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEBLANC is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014