Lebrun, Paul Joseph (CPSO#: 67725)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Trainyards Health and
Wellness Centre
Unit B22
550 Terminal Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1G 0Z3
Phone: (613) 731-4770
Electoral District: 07

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAUL JOSEPH LEBRUN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEBRUN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1996