Lecavalier, Mary Ann (CPSO#: 57674)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 16 May 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 16 May 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 Sep 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jun 1999
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 May 2005