Leclair, Jason Michael (CPSO#: 88929)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 500
267 O'Connor Street
Ottawa ON  K2P 1V3
Phone: (613) 760-3727
Fax: (613) 232-4818
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JASON MICHAEL LECLAIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LECLAIR is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2010