Leclerc, Yves (CPSO#: 50907)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jul 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Laval University, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Mary's Reg Cardiac Care Centre
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Phone: (519) 749-6937
Fax: (519) 749-6492
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Y. Leclerc Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 20 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Leclerc ( CPSO# 50907 )

Business Address:
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Phone Number: (519) 749-6937

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery Effective: 28 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YVES LECLERC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LECLERC is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 5 - Cardiothoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 5 - Cardiothoracic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Sep 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Oct 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 1998