Leddin, Desmond Joseph (CPSO#: 50908)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 20 Jul 1989

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Dublin, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 1985 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 04 Dec 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1979
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Apr 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 20 Jul 1989