Leddy, Danielle S (CPSO#: 55416)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jul 1987

Summary

Former Name: Leddy, Marie Theresa Danielle Suzanne (used until: 30 Apr 1987 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cardio Pulmonary Services
430 The Boardwalk
Suite #206
Waterloo ON  N2T 0C1
Phone: (519) 749-6924
Fax: (519) 749-6982
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Danielle Leddy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 20 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Leddy ( CPSO# 55416 )

Business Address:
Suite 206
430 The Boardwalk
Waterloo ON  N2T 0C1
Phone Number: (519) 741-5252

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 07 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 26 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANIELLE S LEDDY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEDDY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1985 to 15 Jun 1986
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 5 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1987