Ledger, Gabrielle Helena (CPSO#: 79537)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Sep 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Sep 2009

Summary

Former Name: Bouhenic, Gabrielle Helena (used until: 02 Jul 2003 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 201
60 Liberty Street South
Bowmanville ON  L1C 2N5
Phone: (905) 419-5900
Fax: (905) 623-9822
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Durham Mental Health Services
519 Brock Street South
Whitby ON  L1N 4K8
Canada
Phone: 905-666-0831
Fax: 905-666-2976
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GABRIELLE HELENA LEDGER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEDGER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 2009