Leduc, Francois Jacques (CPSO#: 90974)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Sep 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone: (613) 746-4621
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Fundamenski Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 27 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Fundamenski ( CPSO# 82490 )
Dr. F. Leduc ( CPSO# 90974 )

Business Address:
Heart of Ottawa Medical Centre
270 Elgin Street
Ottawa ON  K2P 1M2
Phone Number: (613) 230-8885


Corporation Name: Francois Leduc Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 09 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Fundamenski ( CPSO# 82490 )
Dr. F. Leduc ( CPSO# 90974 )

Business Address:
Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 746-4621

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 31 Aug 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FRANCOIS JACQUES LEDUC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEDUC is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 01 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 02 Aug 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2011 to 31 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 2014