Leduc, Jean Robert Peter (CPSO#: 50910)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 04 Aug 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Aug 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 20 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery Effective: 24 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1980
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Mar 1988
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 04 Aug 2004