Lee, Agnes (CPSO#: 64622)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Sep 1991

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Alberta, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 1991