Lee, Ambrose Wai-Man (CPSO#: 68183)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Dec 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Dec 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:Queen's University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 112
955 Major Mackenzie Drive West
Vaughan ON  L6A 4P9
Phone: (905) 303-0883
Fax: (905) 303-0338
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ambrose Lee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 12 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Lee ( CPSO# 68183 )

Business Address:
Suite 112
955 Major Mackenzie Drive West
Vaughan ON  L6A 4P9
Phone Number: (905) 303-0883

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 03 Dec 1996 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Dec 1998 CFPC Specialist
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 22 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMBROSE WAI-MAN LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Apr 2005 to 31 May 2005
Elective Trainee - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Mar 1997
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 May 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Dec 2009